REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - LIVING FAITH ASSEMBLY HORSHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bringing the message of Christianity to the area of Horsham. To produce giants of faith with the Word To prepare a people of integrity through the fear of God. To raise disciples who can disciple others. To impact our community positively through being a brothers keeper & helping the needy. To see that hopes are kept alive in people through smiles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 17 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ifeseyi Jaiyeola | Chair | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Greggory Simbwa | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Langa | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SYBIL NZERIBE SRN, RM | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anne odoemelam | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.34k | £110.22k | £128.57k | £199.92k | £204.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.88k | £96.59k | £107.70k | £178.91k | £200.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 March 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 March 2023 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
2.2.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLD-WIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE 2.2.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (THE "OBJECTS") 2.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
WORLD-WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Southwater Close
Ifield
CRAWLEY
West Sussex
West Sussex
RH11 0EY
- Phone:
- 07878108989
- Email:
- lfahorsham@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window