THE DAVID LAWRENCE PRICE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Higher Education Fees for University Education for Young People from the following Countries (1) PHILIPPINES 15 STUDENTS (6 at UNIVERSITY OF THE VISAYAS IN CEBU, VISAYAS and 9 at THE UNIVERSITY OF MINDANAO IN DAVAO), (2) GHANA One studying BUSINESS ACCOUNTANCY at HO, VOLTA, and one studying at Univ of Tamale, Northern Terrorities, Ghana. .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Conwy
- Croydon
- Ghana
- Philippines
Governance
- 14 April 2010: Standard registration
- 29 May 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.69k | £23.07k | £19.78k | £24.75k | £20.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.69k | £23.07k | £19.23k | £24.64k | £20.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUST WILL PROVIDE ADEQUATE FINANCE FOR FURTHER, HIGHER AND UNIVERSITY EDUCATION, TO YOUNG PEOPLE ORIGINATING FROM AFRICA, FROM ASIA, AND FROM EASTERN EUROPE, WHO HAVE THE APPROPRIATE INTELLECTUAL ABILITY BUT ARE SO RESTRICTED BY EXTREMELY LIMITED FINANCIAL MEANS THAT THEY WOULD OTHERWISE BE DEPRIVED OF SUCH EDUCATIONAL ADVANCEMENT.
Area of benefit
AFRICA, ASIA, AND EASTERN EUROPE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window