LEICESTERSHIRE, LEICESTER AND RUTLAND COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ENABLES INDIVIDUALS, COMPANIES AND PUBLIC BODIES TO GIVE TO SUPPORT CHARITY AND COMMUNITY NEEDS, BY HELPING DONORS SET UP NAMED FUNDS - EITHER FOR TIME-LIMITED GRANTMAKING, OR BY GENERATING INVESTMENT INCOME FOR "PERPETUAL" GIVING. OPERATES AN ACCESSIBLE AND MONITORED GRANT MAKING PROCESS, MAINLY TO GROUPS ACROSS LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND, BUT BEYOND IF REQUIRED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£612,183
Donations and legacies | £201.48k | |
Charitable activities | £269.03k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £133.52k | |
Other | £8.15k |
Total expenditure:
£707,130
Raising funds | £73.66k | |
Charitable activities | £633.47k | |
Other | £0 |
-£373,443 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £141,414 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £73.66k | |
Charitable expenditure | £633.47k |
People

7 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 30 March 2010: Standard registration
- 30 December 2019: Funds received from 527827 CHARITIES IN CONNECTION WITH ALDERMAN NEWTON'S SCH...
- 30 December 2019: Funds received from 527828 CHARITIES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CITY OF LEICESTER...
- 30 December 2019: Funds received from 527835 CHARITIES IN CONNEXION WITH RUSHEY MEAD SCHOOL
- 30 December 2019: Funds received from 527892 GIRLS' SECONDARY GRAMMAR SCHOOL PRIZE FUND
- 30 December 2019: Funds received from 532266 A H HEADLEY BEQUEST NO 1
- 30 December 2019: Funds received from 532265 A H HEADLEY BEQUEST NO 2
- 30 December 2019: Funds received from 532263 THE WPB PEARSON BEQUEST
- 03 November 2020: Funds received from 228610 HUNTLEY AND PALMERS BENEVOLENT FUND
- 25 May 2023: Funds received from 527839-2 MARJORIE WRIGHT SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- 25 May 2023: Funds received from 527839 CHARITIES IN CONNECTION WITH HUMPHREY PERKINS HIGH...
- 25 May 2023: Funds received from 527842-1 RICHARD SPRIGGS MEMORIAL PRIZES
- 25 May 2023: Funds received from 527842 CHARITIES IN CONNEXION WITH LOUGHBOROUGH BURLEIGH ...
- 25 May 2023: Funds received from 527857 LUTTERWORTH GRAMMAR SCHOOL
- 25 May 2023: Funds received from 527889 THE LONGWILL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
- 25 May 2023: Funds received from 527936 LORD MAYNARD'S TRUST
- 25 May 2023: Funds received from 515108 THE DOCTOR PETER HILL PRIZE FUND
- 25 May 2023: Funds received from 527888 THE LONGWILL AGRICULTURAL SCHOLARSHIPS
- 25 May 2023: Funds received from 527842 CHARITIES IN CONNEXION WITH LOUGHBOROUGH BURLEIGH ...
- 20 July 2023: Funds received from 527944 MARIA PHEASANT'S BEQUEST
- 07 May 2025: Funds received from 507213 FRANCIS CAUS CHARITY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STUART GRAHAM DAWKINS | Chair | 20 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Kevin Michael Hudson | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
David Michael Andrews DL | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
JENNIFER SUSAN HAND | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
MARK TYSON ROBINSON | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD JONATHAN COLTON | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Patrick McCormack | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Vijay Sharma | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
JUSTINE SAMANTHA FLACK | Trustee | 26 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £822.85k | £1.99m | £714.18k | £1.31m | £612.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £690.67k | £1.72m | £714.52k | £833.76k | £707.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £772.96k | N/A | N/A | £141.41k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £93.14k | £282.41k | £150.63k | £475.11k | £201.48k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £627.61k | £1.59m | £431.13k | £700.94k | £269.03k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £19.43k | £26.57k | £25.92k | £191.01k | £69.55k | |
|
Income - Investment | £117.82k | £108.80k | £117.58k | £121.74k | £133.52k | |
|
Income - Other | £3.71k | £9.00k | £14.85k | £10.29k | £8.15k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £255.84k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £638.79k | £1.67m | £668.16k | £782.13k | £633.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £51.88k | £45.33k | £46.36k | £51.64k | £73.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £35.43k | £40.47k | £0 | £64.01k | £73.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £533.21k | £1.54m | £0 | £628.50k | £466.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £824 | £826 | £3.65m | £1.04k | £775 | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.69m | £3.44m | £0 | £3.64m | £4.33m | |
|
Other assets | £376.62k | £493.92k | £537.71k | £845.16k | £424.90k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £103.94k | £50.81k | £19.58k | £27.55k | £22.21k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
A THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF LEICESTERSHIRE, LEICESTER AND RUTLAND AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD (THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT'), AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS INCLUDING THE NEEDS OF CARERS B OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE WHICH ARE, IN THE OPINION OF THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES, BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
LEICESTERSHIRE, LEICESTER AND RUTLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEICESTERSHIRE LEICESTER AND
RUTLAND COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
3 WYCLIFFE STREET
LEICESTER
LE1 5LR
- Phone:
- 01162624916
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window