LAWYERS WITHOUT BORDERS UK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. TO PROMOTE THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF JUSTICE AND PROPER ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR 2. TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Paraguay
- Rwanda
- Sierra Leone
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Uganda
- United States
Governance
- 16 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Lewis | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bart Gombert | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robin Taylor | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Raad | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOEL COHEN | Trustee | 08 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £476 | £22.38k | £9.95k | £357 | £725 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.66k | £335 | £4.15k | £2.25k | £982 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 NOVEMBER 2003 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 12 JANUARY 2010 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 4 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF JUSTICE AND PROPER ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY A UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO THE LAW AND LEGAL PROCESS IN SUCH COUNTRIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE, AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS B PROMOTING EDUCATION AND TRAINING INTO THE LAW AND LEGAL PROCESS OF SUCH COUNTRIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE C ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF LEGAL SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR INADEQUATE MEANS WOULD NOT OTHERWISE HAVE ACCESS TO SUCH SERVICES D THE PROVISION OF PRO BONO LEGAL SERVICES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 2 TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS A EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS B PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS
Area of benefit
SUCH COUNTRIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vistra Uk Ltd
Suite 1, 7th Floor
50 Broadway
LONDON
SW1H 0BL
- Phone:
- 03000 30 5962
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window