Accounts and annual returns THE SIR FRANK LOWE FOOTBALL TRUST

Charity number: 1135854
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2014 08 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2013 04 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2012 25 March 2013 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2012 13 May 2013 164 days late
Annual return 31 January 2011 28 March 2012 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2011 12 December 2011 12 days late