STREET ANGELS CHRISTIAN NIGHTLIFE INITIATIVES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting over 130 local communities across UK to run programmes such as Street , Club, Festival, Youth and Community Angels which provide safe places and safe people in town centres on weekend nights or at events. We are a national voice for these projects and encourage / provide networking, promotion, training, resources, etc. We run Love Your Streets and the #Do1NiceThing campaign.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Isle Of Man
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Seychelles
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 17 June 2010: Standard registration
- 27 May 2020: Funds received from 1122478 NORFOLK STREET PARTNERSHIP
- 19 April 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.02k | £52.16k | £38.84k | £29.00k | £31.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.20k | £44.75k | £40.80k | £43.64k | £33.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/06/2013
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELLBEING OF THE INHABITANTS OF LOCALITIES ACROSS THE UK AND THE WORLD, BY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE AND THE FORMATION OF STREET ANGELS PROGRAMME FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION OF THE MEMBERS OF SUCH COMMUNITY. B) TO SUPPORT, CARE AND TREAT PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE HOMELESS AND SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISABILITY, OLD AGE, ALCOHOLISM, DRUG ADDICTION, OFFENDING BEHAVIOUR, OR ANY OTHER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY, AS AN EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
WEST YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window