GLENCREE CENTRE FOR PEACE AND RECONCILIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 10 August 2010: Standard registration
- 15 February 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2012 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 FEBRUARY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH A VIEW TO RELIEVING SUFFERING, POVERTY AND DISTRESS AND BUILDING AND MAINTAINING SOCIAL COHESION AND TRUST WITHIN AND BETWEEN COMMUNITIES BY: (A) INVESTIGATING AND IDENTIFYING PROBABLE CAUSES OF THE CONFLICT; (B) EXAMINING PROBABLE SOLUTIONS TO THE CONFLICT THROUGH PARTICIPATORY RESEARCH INTO RELEVANT ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL ISSUES; (C) MEDIATING WITH PARTIES TO THE CONFLICT AND OTHERS TOGETHER TO DISCUSS SUCH RESEARCH AND POSSIBLE SOLUTIONS ENABLING THEM TO BUILD RELATIONSHIPS OF TRUST; (D) RECOMMENDING TO THE INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITY AND THE PARTIES INVOLVED THE MEASURES WHICH, IN THE TRUSTEES' OPINION, ARE LIKELY TO RESULT IN THE RESOLUTION OR PREVENTION OF THE CONFLICT OR THE REDUCTION OF ANY HUMANITARIAN CRISIS THAT MAY ENSUE FROM THE CONFLICT; AND (E) PUBLISHING REPORTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ON THE CAUSES AND RECOMMENDED SOLUTIONS OF PARTICULAR CONFLICTS. PROVIDED THAT ALL ACTIVITIES SHALL BE BALANCED AND SHALL MAINTAIN OR ENHANCE THE CHARITY'S COMMITMENT TO REMAINING IMPARTIAL.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window