VARIAV SUNNEE VOHRA KHIDMAT COMMITTEE (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
VSVKCUK collect membership fees from Members and collect donations in the form Zakat /Sadqa/Lillah in UK and send funds to Variav (India), The collected funds are used to pay for hospital services in Variav known as the Variav Charitable Dispensary (VCD) and food parcels for the needy in Variav.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Burma
- India
Governance
- 31 December 2010: Standard registration
- VARIAN SUNNEE VOHRA KHIDMAT COMMITTEE UK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ESOOF AKHOON | Chair | 12 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Imran Aboo | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shoaib Aboo | Trustee | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ayub Patel | Trustee | 22 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.09k | £28.77k | £34.99k | £23.59k | £33.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.63k | £19.94k | £20.26k | £18.63k | £29.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 FEBRUARY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 12 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE MUSLIM INHABITANTS AND THEIR DESCENDANTS OF VARIAV SURAT, GUJARAT, INDIA AND INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE NOW RESIDENTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD BY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; (D) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH; AND (E) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE;
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 DYNEVOR ROAD
LONDON
N16 0DL
- Phone:
- 02072491741
- Email:
- secretary@vsvkc.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window