KING'S CHURCH AMERSHAM

Charity number: 1136061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advancing the Christian faith in accordance with our Statement of Beliefs, relieving sickness and financial hardship, provision of facilities for educational, recreational and other leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare. For detailed information see website www.kca.church

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 April 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • KINGS CHURCH AMERSHAM (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alistair Stephen Youngman Trustee 01 March 2023
None on record
Kathleen Mary Nussbaum Trustee 14 December 2020
None on record
Simon Harding Trustee 14 December 2020
None on record
Carol-Anne Tomlins Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Paul Jeremy Thomas Trustee 11 October 2018
None on record
DAVID BRUCE PATTERSON Trustee 14 February 2016
AMERSHAM OLD TOWN CHRISTIAN (BAPTISTS) FELLOWSHIP TRUST
Received: On time
Simon Peter Rose Trustee 23 November 2014
None on record
JULIAN VINCENT NICHOLAS DAGNALL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £595.63k £607.99k £625.16k £751.91k £945.59k
Total expenditure £593.92k £581.63k £653.27k £740.39k £803.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.82k £7.00k £7.00k £7.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £499.48k £576.79k £544.20k £639.76k £814.20k
Income - Other trading activities £64.04k £10.97k £40.49k £77.66k £85.42k
Income - Charitable activities £32.07k £20.22k £40.44k £34.50k £44.83k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £49 £17 £24 £0 £1.14k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £5.07k £0 £20.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £558.42k £567.84k £617.20k £695.81k £750.05k
Expenditure - Raising funds £35.50k £13.79k £36.07k £44.58k £53.64k
Expenditure - Governance £9.16k £10.07k £9.62k £12.06k £10.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £7.50k £7.50k £1.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £3.34m £3.28m £3.19m £3.11m £3.02m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £172.38k £187.51k £175.74k £214.07k £156.56k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £557.96k £486.46k £416.66k £355.56k £73.55k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
INDENTURES DATED 25/11/1824, 22/2/1832, 7/2/1834 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 11/11/1941 AND 6/3/2012
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL DOCUMENTS
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 03 April 2012 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Kings Church
Raans Road
AMERSHAM
HP6 6LX
Phone:
01494431882