Financial history LCI - UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1139606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.62k £9.03k £7.41k £6.32k £26.99k
Total expenditure £125.58k £15.01k £5.56k £7.84k £8.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A