LCI - UK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LCI-UK is a charitable membership organisation supporting research into and dissemination of lean construction principles and best practice with a view to improving public sector construction. Our aim is to provide those commissioning and delivering public works with the information necessary to make informed purchasing and delivery decisions for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Allan Edgcumbe | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Simon Perks | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Richard Gates | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Paul Johnson | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Anderson | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Robert Walley | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tony Blanch | Trustee | 10 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN M SWAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.62k | £9.03k | £7.41k | £6.32k | £26.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.58k | £15.01k | £5.56k | £7.84k | £8.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/05/2013 as amended on 05 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RESEARCH INTO LEAN CONSTRUCTION PRINCIPLES AND BEST PRACTICE AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF. 'LEAN CONSTRUCTION' MEANS ALL DESIGNING, BUILDING, REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE ACTIVITIES OVER THE LIFE OF A CONSTRUCTED FACILITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lee Dicketts & Co
3 East Point
High Street
Seal
SEVENOAKS
TN15 0EG
- Phone:
- 03000303044
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window