JAMIA - AL - FURQAAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Teaching
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 08 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HASSAAN RAZA AKHTAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ali Akhtar | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHAMIM AKHTAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.36k | £4.79k | £8.42k | £5.93k | £8.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.86k | £4.05k | £8.94k | £6.32k | £5.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH ON OR AROUND SHEFFIELD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE BY THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP. B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY OF SHEFFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREA. C. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES I THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR INDIVIDUALS PRIMARILY WITHIN (THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY), THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY AND FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE. D. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
703 ABBEYDALE ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S7 2BE
- Phone:
- 01142555336
- Email:
- INFO@CHUGHTAI.UK.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window