THE PELL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Trust are to further such objects or purposes which are exclusively charitable according to the law of England and Wales in any part of the world and in such manner as the Trustees may in their absolute discretion think fit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 April 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ludlow Trust Company Ltd | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
Oliver David Pell | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Victoria Lundgren | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
GORDON FRANCIS PELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
MARIAN PRISCILLA PELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.55k | £83.45k | £10.48k | £174.71k | £136.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.07k | £93.64k | £170.64k | £129.47k | £120.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 02 December 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 02 December 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 27 April 2023 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 19 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
1 TO FURTHER SUCH OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. 2 THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME AND, IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION, THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND IN DOING SO MAY MAKE GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO SUCH INSTITUTIONS, FOUNDATIONS, TRUSTS, INDIVIDUALS AND UNDERTAKINGS, AT SUCH TIME, AND IN SUCH MANNER AND OF SUCH AMOUNT AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
- Phone:
- 0117 313 8200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window