Accounts and annual returns SOUTHPORT SOUP KITCHEN

Charity Number: 1137947
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 August 2024 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 05 August 2024 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 18 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window