THE CHAPEL OF THE ANNUNCIATION, FURNEUX PELHAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity undertakes the day-to-day running of The Chapel of the Annunciation, which is a Roman Catholic Chapel situated in Furneux Pelham, Hertfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 July 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 21 May 2010: Standard registration
- 24 September 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 27/07/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.10k | £5.21k | £7.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.93k | £7.37k | £6.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 27 July 2013 | 27 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 28 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 19 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/04/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window