KRIYA YOGA (LEICESTER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meetings held at meditation centres in Leicester and the UK in teaching "Kriya Yoga"
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- India
Governance
- 04 July 2011: Standard registration
- KRIYA YOGA TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SURESH GOHIL | Chair | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOSNA RAMJI | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £481 | £522 | £211 | £681 | £6.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | £2.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AS AMENDED ON 05/01/2010 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE TEACHINGS AND SCIENCE OF KRIYA YOGA IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND INDIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 CRANBORNE GARDENS
OADBY
LEICESTER
LE2 4EZ
- Phone:
- 07535000744
- Email:
- suresh@arpan.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window