Accounts and annual returns NORTHERN LIGHTS SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity Number: 1136322
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 23 June 2020 On Time