Financial history HORNSEY LANE ESTATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1136559
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £409.78k £615.63k £472.04k £394.08k £457.59k
Total expenditure £380.82k £441.80k £495.74k £527.78k £472.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £235.00k £247.00k £278.94k £280.42k £309.33k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £555.83k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £59.42k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £9 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £370 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £438.48k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £3.32k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £15.14k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A