THE KATHMANDU ANIMAL TREATMENT CENTRE, U.K.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funds are raised in the UK and elsewhere for the benefit and welfare of all animals in Nepal. The charity works with local partners to oversee and support large scale animal birth control programmes to humanely reduce the population of stray dogs on the streets of Kathmandu and other urbanised, high-dog population areas within Nepal. It also supports a vaccination programme against rabies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Nepal
Governance
- 27 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carl Salter | Chair | 19 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ben Charman | Trustee | 23 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clinton Powell | Trustee | 22 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samuel George Davies | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Roger Palmer | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.44k | £70.94k | £50.07k | £47.47k | £41.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.44k | £42.76k | £29.62k | £39.75k | £56.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF STRAY DOGS IN KATHMANDU IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS
Area of benefit
KATHMANDU NEPAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Wyke Road
Weymouth
DT4 9QF
- Phone:
- 01305777168
- Email:
- treasurer.uk@katcentre.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window