UK CHINESE DANCE AND CULTURE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1139711
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote chinese culture and merge with British values

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £12,084
Total expenditure: £26,807

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 January 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Qiong Wei Trustee 08 February 2023
None on record
Yu Xia Zhang Trustee 12 March 2022
None on record
STUART BYFORD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £8.71k £0 £0 £0 £12.08k
Total expenditure £17.36k £0 £0 £0 £26.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 06 March 2025 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 25 March 2024 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 13 February 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 13 February 2023 373 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 13 February 2023 738 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 BEAUMONT STREET
LONDON
W1G 6DG
Phone:
02079353238
Email:
No information available