Financial history WOMEN'S AID LEICESTERSHIRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1136419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.58m £2.13m £2.16m £1.73m £1.49m
Total expenditure £1.68m £2.18m £1.94m £1.63m £1.49m
Income from government contracts £948.28k £519.65k £841.70k £481.91k £409.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £17.52k £69.98k £59.84k £92.27k £33.95k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.56m £2.15m £2.09m £1.63m £1.45m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £428 £83 £8 £536 £1.28k
Income - Other £4.54k £4.00k £7.05k £7.91k £5.30k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £49.12k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.68m £2.18m £1.94m £1.63m £1.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.43k £4.25k £4.25k £8.10k £4.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0