THE PETERBOROUGH CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORT TO LOCAL CHURCHES IN THE CIRCUIT TO PROVIDE ACTS OF WORSHIP - IN PERSON AND ONLINE - FOR MEMBERS AND NON-MEMBERS. THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIANITY THROUGH SERMONS, COURSES AND SMALL GROUPS. PASTORAL WORK INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK AND BEREAVED. PROMOTING CHRISTIANITY THROUGH EVENTS AND SERVICES. SUPPORTING OTHER CHARITIES LOCALLY, NATIONALLY AND OVERSEAS FINANCIALLY AND WITH PRAYER.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

37 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 21 April 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
37 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev LANGLEY ADRIAN JAMES MACKRELL-HEY | Chair | 30 December 2013 |
|
|||||
Nicholas James Drury | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Dallman | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Erica Dorothy Pilkinton | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Judith Robinson | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm James Robinson | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Constance Hunt | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Whiting | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Elizabeth Armstrong | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim On Wing Wong | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Julie Delegate | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robert Abel | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Sylvia Parker Sylvia | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Janet Titterton | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|||||
David Whiting | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Holmes | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Catherine Joan Ruffles | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Nicola Jane Ward | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather Joyce Black | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH KELLY | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Bereznyckyj | Trustee | 18 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE BARBER | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Christine Ritson Kell | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mick Goodman | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sarah Catherine Gower | Trustee | 30 December 2013 |
|
|||||
Rev DOUGLAS GEORGE STEVENS | Trustee | 29 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MONICA STURGESS | Trustee | 09 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DENISE MARILYN SARAH WATSON | Trustee | 11 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL ANTHONY LIGHTFOOT | Trustee | 27 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev GRAHAM WESLEY TOOTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JOHN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev DAVID PARKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ANNIE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN KEENEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE JOY OCTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR HOWLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr John Featherstone Hewitson | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.54k | £183.66k | £170.37k | £194.07k | £150.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.94k | £160.99k | £134.40k | £141.74k | £181.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Circuit Office
Brookside Methodist Church
Gunthorpe Road
Gunthorpe
PETERBOROUGH
PE4 7TG
- Phone:
- 01733554815
- Email:
- pborocircuitoffice@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window