NORTHERN INTER-SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NISCU is a non-denominational organisation committed to Christian ministry and to acting co-operatively with local churches in its work with young people. It acts as a resource for local schools so that the central beliefs of the Christian faith may be communicated to young people in an appropriate way as part of their education. It operates in seven geographical areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GRIME | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Mathew David Ineson | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|||||
IAN HARVIE | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|||||
RUTH HOUSTON | Trustee | 13 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR RICHARDS | Trustee | 13 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £292.57k | £384.51k | £301.79k | £281.62k | £254.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £298.20k | £269.44k | £275.84k | £295.19k | £333.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF SCHOOL AGE IN NORTH WEST ENGLAND IN ACCORDANCE WITH BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO, AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE DIRECTORS (TRUSTEES) MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, SO THAT THEY * GROW IN THEIR KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THAT FAITH BY HAVING THIS EXPLAINED TO THEM IN WAYS WHICH ARE RELEVANT TO THEM AND APPROPRIATE TO THEIR NEEDS * GROW IN UNDERSTANDING THE IMPLICATIONS OF THIS FAITH AND IN SPIRITUAL AND EMOTIONAL WELL-BEING * GROW IN POSITIVE RELATIONSHIPS WITHIN THEIR COMMUNITY, IN UNDERSTANDING OTHER PEOPLE AND IN RESPECT FOR PEOPLE OF DIFFERENT CULTURE AND BELIEF
Area of benefit
NORTH WEST ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
NISCU
57 LANCASTER ROAD
CARNFORTH
LANCASHIRE
LA5 9LE
- Phone:
- 01524732764
- Email:
- admin@niscu.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window