Accounts and annual returns MILLERS DENE DAY CARE

Charity Number: 1136493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 February 2025 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 January 2025 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 480 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2024 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2024 365 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required