Financial history MILLERS DENE DAY CARE

Charity number: 1136493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £320.89k £412.41k £461.66k £0
Total expenditure £39.78k £320.89k £412.41k £461.66k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £226.30k N/A N/A N/A