BRISTOL CHRISTIAN ACTION NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working in Bristol and S.West with churches and orgs: - to provide training and support designed to enable individuals & groups etc to relieve poverty - to identify gaps in the help being given and encouraging shared pieces of work - enabling them to have a voice on issues around social need and social cohesion. - establishing links with statutory bodies and national organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 18 June 2010: Standard registration
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 23 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE BRISTOL AND SOUTH WEST AREA OF THE UK BY WORKING WITH AND PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO LOCAL CHURCHES AND ORGANISATIONS ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION WITHIN THE REGION. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN ISSUES RELATING TO HOMELESSNESS AND METAL HEALTH. 3) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, CHURCHES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL AND SOUTH WEST
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window