JOANNA LEEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Joanna works with women, particularly those at risk of, or involved in prostitution in Leeds. Through practical and emotional support, befriending and mentoring we aim to enable these women to exit prostitution and sustain a new life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,925 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 28 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angharad Turner-Fielder | Chair | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Wainwright | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Olamide Ojo | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Rebecca Brencher | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Adams | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lana Northey | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Anne France | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £199.15k | £233.50k | £180.84k | £197.13k | £186.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.89k | £173.31k | £200.07k | £197.89k | £191.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.00k | £38.17k | £5.01k | £5.10k | £8.93k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 08 OCT 2020 as amended on 20 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF VULNERABLE WOMEN, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE AT RISK OF OR INVOLVED IN PROSTITUTION IN LEEDS, OR SUCH OTHER LOCATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED TO THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY
Area of benefit
LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Sydenham Street
Leeds
LS11 9RR
- Phone:
- 07854857116
- Email:
- hello@joannaproject.co.uk
- Website:
-
joannaproject.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window