TWEENIE TOTS 2 COMMUNITY CHILDCARE SERVICES LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a parent-led community childcare service for children aged 2-11 years. Children from our recognised deprived area can gain access to good quality safe facilities & develop their cognitive and educational skills whilst interacting with their peers and becoming independent from their parents/carers. We support families at an early stage, some of which are highly vulnerable with complex needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sefton
Governance
- 01 June 2010: Standard registration
- 28 November 2011: Funds received from 1115898 TWEENIE TOTS 2 PLAYGROUP
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR LUKE RIMMER | Chair | 14 June 2013 |
|
|||||
MAUREEN WALKER-MILLER | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE MARIE HELM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £235.56k | £212.16k | £180.79k | £121.53k | £159.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.60k | £186.16k | £189.56k | £181.93k | £197.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £14.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £14.28k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 November 2022 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2021
(These accounts |
30 November 2022 | 153 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/03/2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIVES OF CHILDREN AGED 2-11 YEARS WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED THROUGH LOW INCOME AND LACK OF OPPORTUNITIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ENGLISH MARTYRS PARISH HALL
SCHOOL LANE
LITHERLAND
LIVERPOOL
L21 7LX
- Phone:
- 01519491225
- Email:
- tweenietots2@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window