THE SHAMROCK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shamrock steamed for a total of 18 days during 2023 to 2024 during which she was on display on the lake and around Windermere Jetty Museum. It took part in the Coronation Steam. A booklet The Story of Shamrock sold about 550 copies, surplus after printing cost going to the Trust. A comprehensive risk assessment was prepared. There now fifty friends who contribute to maintaining the vessel. .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 22 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Thomas Beale Mr | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Austin Peter Hammond Mr | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Philip Simpson | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY ANN BULLOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER MALLINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTYN BLACKBURN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.20k | £1.85k | £4.27k | £5.52k | £5.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.20k | £7.18k | £3.75k | £4.40k | £2.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 APRIL 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 AUG 2020
Charitable objects
1 THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION AND OPERATION OF THE HISTORIC WINDERMERE STEAM POWERED SALOON LAUNCH 'SHAMROCK' 2 ENABLING 'SHAMROCK' TO CONTINUE, AS IT HAS SINCE 1906, AS A QUINTESSENTIAL PART OF WINDERMERE CULTURE DELIGHTING VISITORS TO THE LAKE 3 THE USE OF THE VESSEL TO SHOW TO THE PUBLIC THE HISTORICAL EVOLUTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF MECHANICAL POWER IN SMALL BOATS 4 THE ACQUISITION AND PRESERVATION OF BOOKS, DRAWINGS, RECORDS, PHOTOGRAPHS, FILMS, AND ANY ARTIFICATS RELATING TO 'SHAMROCK' AND HER SISTER VESSELS 5 THE PROVISION OF EXHIBITIONS, DISPLAYS AND PUBLICATIONS IN A VARIETY OF FORMATS TO INFORM AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC 6 THE TRAINING IN THE TRADITIONAL BOAT BUILDING, ENGINEERING AND OTHER SKILLS REQUIRED FOR BUILDING, MAINTAINING AND OPERATING SMALL STEAM POWERED VESSELS
Area of benefit
WINDERMERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
24a Egerton Park
Birkenhead
CH42 4QZ
- Phone:
- 01516440186
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window