RITE TO FREEDOM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rite to Freedom deliver programmes for adults in recovery from addiction. We support people in changing their lives through mentoring, self-empowerment, wilderness experiences and the power of personal stories. Our nature-based courses complement traditional pharmaceutical treatments and include long-term pathways for participants providing continuity to support full recovery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 April 2011: Standard registration
- 09 December 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WRITE TO FREEDOM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.45k | £24.69k | £85.68k | £78.01k | £75.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.72k | £30.93k | £55.63k | £66.80k | £94.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 130 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 130 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCORPORATED 02/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/03/2011 as amended on 22 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRTAE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL COURSES, TRAINING, MENTORING AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window