THE DAVID TILLEY CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
£23,280.00 St Michael School Kilolo, Tanzania: Sponsorship of 41 students : 40 DTCF, 1 St Michaels Church Chester Square, London. £2,595.00 Mvumi School, Tanzania: 3 students A level course fees. £1,000 Iringa School for the Deaf, Tanzania: towards salaries of ancillary staff. £1,000 to RAP-CD School, Kasese, Uganda: towards septic tank system.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 21 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK WILLIAM TILLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Elizabeth Jane Gill | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Laura Ann King | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW CALVERT | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW BARRY WYKES | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr RICHARD GEORGE GILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN TILLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY JOHN VAUGHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.63k | £35.37k | £32.54k | £33.48k | £35.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.02k | £34.77k | £36.72k | £35.49k | £33.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF SOCIALLY AND/OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN IN AFRICA
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Massers Barn
Baynards
Rudgwick
HORSHAM
RH12 3AD
- Phone:
- 01903740633
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window