Accounts and annual returns WILKINS MEMORIAL HALL TRUST

Charity Number: 1136503
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 11 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required