Financial history GREAT ABINGTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1136090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £22.40k £12.91k £10.06k £21.19k £14.14k
Total expenditure £14.00k £15.19k £11.85k £25.58k £17.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A