Trustees GREAT ABINGTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1136090

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Louise Haylock | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grace Carnegie-Riviere | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Morris | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Carter | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Norton | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Weston | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Chapman | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bertrand Flipo | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Cooke | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tasha Whittaker | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katie Mannion | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.