Financial history BACK ON THE MAP LIMITED

Charity number: 1138833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £882.39k £875.64k £1.11m £887.24k £1.26m
Total expenditure £929.13k £725.11k £846.34k £880.12k £970.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £122.23k £228.14k £111.29k £118.75k £259.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £434.24k £348.55k £588.48k £316.21k £635.14k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £448.15k £527.09k £516.81k £549.89k £593.09k
Income - Other £0 £0 £8.39k £21.13k £31.17k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £332.27k £349.39k £402.57k £482.97k £561.88k
Expenditure - Raising funds £279.27k £375.72k £443.77k £397.15k £408.78k
Expenditure - Governance £3.70k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £317.60k £0 £0 £0 £0