NTC COBHAM CHARITY FOR DUTCH LANGUAGE AND CULTURE COBHAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our school provides Dutch lessons for native speakers at ACS Cobham. Lessons take place once a week from 15:30 until 17:30. The schools follow the Dutch curriculum and teachers need to have a formal Dutch qualification.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 August 2010: Standard registration
- 14 December 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 14 December 2020: Funds transferred to 1179820 ACS INTERNATIONAL SCHOOLS LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.00k | £9.76k | £11.80k | £9.07k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.78k | £15.97k | £13.14k | £14.40k | £2.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 02 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 28 August 2018 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION IN THE DUTCH/FLEMISH LANGUAGE FOR CHILDREN WHO ARE ALREADY FAMILIAR WITH THE LANGUAGE AND/OR HAVE AT LEAST ONE PARENT/CARER SPEAKING THE LANGUAGE AND/OR ONE PARENT/CARER WITH THE DUTCH/BELGIAN NATIONALITY. B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE DUTCH/FLEMISH CULTURE THROUGH SPECIAL ACTIVITIES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window