HENRY SURTEES FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist people with brain or physical injuries caused by accident to return to community living by providing support for equipment and facilities, to initiate campaigns designed to prevent brain injury in motorsport accidents, and to provide opportunity for young people to be trained in motorsport-related programmes in technology, engineering and road safety instructions for two and four wheels.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 August 2010: Standard registration
- 24 March 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1021367 Air Ambulance Charity Kent Surrey Sussex
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 801013 LONDON'S AIR AMBULANCE LIMITED
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1078685 THE DORSET AND SOMERSET AIR AMBULANCE CHARITY
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1084305 YORKSHIRE AIR AMBULANCE LIMITED
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1129027 WEST MIDLANDS CENTRAL ACCIDENT RESUSCITATION EMERG...
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1092204 THE GREAT NORTH AIR AMBULANCE SERVICE
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1143118 MIDLANDS AIR AMBULANCE CHARITY
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1075641 NORTH WEST AIR AMBULANCE
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1017501 Lincolnshire and Nottinghamshire Air Ambulance Cha...
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1121300 GREAT WESTERN AIR AMBULANCE CHARITY
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1133295 CORNWALL AIR AMBULANCE TRUST
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1104731 LONDON PLAY
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 275686 FRIENDS OF VALENCE SCHOOL
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 288018 THE CHILDREN'S TRUST
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1070676 NORTH WEST WHEELCHAIR RUGBY
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1162504 OSPREYS WHEELCHAIR RUGBY
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1096669 LONDON WHEELCHAIR RUGBY CLUB
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 802872 WHIZZ-KIDZ
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1094677 HOPE FOR TOMORROW
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1148093 WINGS FOR WARRIORS
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1098364 LINCOLNSHIRE INTEGRATED VOLUNTARY EMERGENCY SERVIC...
- 24 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1074729 THE BRITISH DISABLED ANGLING ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276.03k | £276.03k | £51.42k | £25.93k | £21.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £299.75k | £299.75k | £178.66k | £127.81k | £592.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 21 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
1 TO ASSIST PEOPLE WITH BRAIN OR PHYSICAL INJURIES CAUSED BY ACCIDENT TO RETURN TO COMMUNITY LIVING BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT FOR EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES 2 PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING ASSOCIATED WITH MOTORSPORT RELATED PROGRAMMES IN TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING AND ROAD SAFETY INSTRUCTION FOR TWO AND FOUR WHEELS 3 TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS B ADVANCING EDUCATION; AND C RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window