Accounts and annual returns SIDMOUTH LIVING WITH CANCER SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1136768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 June 2024 222 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required