LANCASHIRE CAT RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to; To rescue and rehome, "Stray", "Injured", "Sick" or "Unwanted" cats and kittens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 16 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Margaret Lomax | Chair | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary House | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Antony Donickey | Trustee | 05 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA DIANA PLACE | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN LOMAX | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER JANE LOUISE COUPE | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAWN MARGARET SWIFT | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.93k | £21.57k | £24.96k | £121.10k | £159.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.65k | £16.82k | £19.86k | £54.73k | £59.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 November 2024 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 22 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS AND KITTENS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 NEW LANE
PENWORTHAM
PRESTON
PR1 9JH
- Phone:
- 01772750263
- Email:
- info@lancatrescue.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window