Accounts and annual returns WHITE ROCKS WESTERN RIDING GROUP

Charity number: 1136681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 06 December 2024 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 06 December 2024 372 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 18 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 18 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required