THAMESIDE NATURE PARK LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY OPERATES THE THAMESIDE NATURE PARK, WHICH IS FORMED OF RECLAIMED LANDFILL FOR THE CONSERVATION OF WILDLIFE AND SUSTAINABILITY OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £166,292 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
31 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 28 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Yates | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Jeremy Dagley | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Samantha Quill | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Adrian Laurence Pritchard | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Keeley Ann Hazelhurst | Trustee | 07 June 2016 |
|
|||||
DAVID ANTHONY HOLT | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR ANDREW JAMES IMPEY | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.72k | £18.08k | £135.68k | £281.76k | £307.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.31k | £71.96k | £142.80k | £121.15k | £135.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.93k | £14.39k | N/A | N/A | £166.29k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
A. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION, THE ENVIRONMENTAL IMPROVEMENT AND THE ENVIRONMENTAL MAINTENANCE OF: THE AREA KNOWN AS THURROCK THAMESIDE NATURE PARK COMPRISING APPROXIMATELY 1,000 ACRES OF LAND IN THE UNITARY AUTHORITY OF THURROCK INCLUDING THE RESTORED LANDFILL SITE AT MUCKING AND ANY ADDITIONAL LAND THAT IS CONTIGUOUS WITH THIS AREA; II) THE WILDLIFE AND HABITATS OF THIS AREA; AND III) THE ZOOLOGICAL, BOTANICAL, HISTORICAL, ARCHAEOLOGICAL, GEOGRAPHICAL, CULTURAL, SCIENTIFIC AND HERITAGE INTEREST IN THIS AREA; B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN: THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES ASSOCIATED WITH THE ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION, IMPROVEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF THIS AREA AND OTHER AREAS LIKE THAMESIDE NATURE PARK; II) THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF CONSERVING AND ENHANCING THE BIODIVERSITY OF THIS AREA AND OTHER AREAS LIKE THAMESIDE NATURE PARK; AND III) THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT WHERE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS"
Area of benefit
THURROCK THAMESIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Essex Wildlife Trust
Joan Elliot Visitor Centre
Abbotts Hall Farm
Maldon Road
Great Wigborough
COLCHEST
- Phone:
- 01621862960
- Email:
- admin@essex.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window