FRIENDS OF CULCHETH LINEAR PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Culcheth Linear Park aim to improve and promote the facilities, plants and wildlife within the Park and provide opportunities for educational and recreational activities. We want to improve and enrich the health and surroundings of present and future visitors to the Park of all ages and abilities. If you share these aims and objectives, please support us by becoming a member.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warrington
Governance
- 13 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEO DEAN | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE HUNTER | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
KAREN CHRISTINE SCHOFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/11/2019 | 19/11/2020 | 19/11/2021 | 19/11/2022 | 19/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10 | £10 | £10 | £10 | £5 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10 | £10 | £10 | £10 | £10 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 November 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 November 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 November 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 November 2020 | 26 October 2021 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 November 2019 | 10 October 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED 16 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CULCHETH, WARRINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF CULCHETH LINEAR PARK.
Area of benefit
CULCHETH, WARRINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 PRESTWICH AVENUE
CULCHETH
WARRINGTON
WA3 4NA
- Phone:
- 07904 910443
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window