Financial history BAYT UL MAQDIS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1139176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £179.05k £307.46k £332.09k £332.48k £443.22k
Total expenditure £181.16k £195.04k £277.94k £330.11k £350.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.08k £46.09k N/A N/A N/A