Financial history THYROID PATIENT ADVOCACY

Charity number: 1138608
Charity reporting is overdue by 451 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £5.70k £6.79k £2.76k £2.76k £1.15k
Total expenditure £8.49k £16.18k £4.75k £4.75k £3.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A