HEBDEN BRIDGE LITTLE THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1137500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the charity is to promote, maintain, improve and advance education by the encouragement of the arts including, without limitation, the arts of drama, mime, dance, singing and music.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £54,306
Total expenditure: £51,919

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Calderdale

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 August 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN HIRST Chair
None on record
HANNAH STOW Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
GILLIAN MARY WALKER Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Susan Riches Trustee 30 September 2016
None on record
Jenny Gore Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
TREVOR SMITH Trustee 20 July 2012
None on record
ARLENE DUFFY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £46.72k £20.56k £31.97k £35.67k £54.31k
Total expenditure £32.73k £31.77k £28.23k £36.25k £51.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £23.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 November 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 November 2022 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hebden Bridge Little Theatre
Holme Street
HEBDEN BRIDGE
West Yorkshire
HX7 8EE
Phone:
07796502809
Email:
No information available