MENTER BRO ALED CYF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Safeguarding and promoting cultural, educational, recreational and enterprise opportunities for the community of Bro Aled.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 16 May 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Conwy
Governance
- 25 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EIFION MORRIS JONES | Chair | 13 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Trefor Aled Roberts | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
GWYNFRYN DAVIES | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
LONA WILLIAMS | Trustee | 08 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TREBOR ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERWYN EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Eifion Jones | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CELFYN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALWYN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
||||||
JENNY MACDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN NEIL MACDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 16/05/2020 | 16/05/2021 | 16/05/2022 | 16/05/2023 | 16/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | £8.50k | £15.25k | £1.59k | £10.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.44k | £1.29k | £8.15k | £2.26k | £10.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 16 May 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 May 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 May 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 May 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 May 2020 | 08 May 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 6 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 28 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SWYDDFA POST
CANOL Y LLAN
LLANSANNAN
DINBYCH
LL16 5HN
- Phone:
- 07876555755
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window