Financial history ROYAL SCOT LOCOMOTIVE & GENERAL TRUST

Charity number: 1139588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.47m £8.58m £10.02m £6.07m £13.87m
Total expenditure £4.21m £4.47m £13.50m £11.19m £7.39m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.89m £4.84m £2.72m £1.30m £6.24m
Income - Other trading activities £3.27m £3.43m £3.89m £4.29m £4.12m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £316.87k £322.17k £309.35k £489.52k £790.79k
Income - Other £0 £0 £3.10m £0 £2.71m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.15m £4.41m £13.42m £7.86m £7.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £27.86k £34.43k £52.08k £31.50k £16.71k
Expenditure - Governance £18.23k £0 £0 £23.95k £34.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £27.86k £34.43k £17.93k £18.98k £16.71k
Expenditure - Other £29.78k £29.78k £29.78k £3.30m £0