ANIMAL WELFARE AND RESCUE ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue of domestic animals, that have been neglected or physically abused by their owners. After medical treatment should this be required, they remain with us and are cared for within the Sanctuary. Injured wildlife rescued, are brought in to our Sanctuary for medical care and rehabilitation, then released back into the wild. All animals are seen by a Vet and given treatment accordingly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE ZENA CINDY SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
TANJA CAREY | Trustee | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/12/2019 | 30/12/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.30k | £8.50k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.90k | £7.98k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2019 | 11 May 2021 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 15 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
1 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANIMAL WELFARE BY THE PROVISION OF CARE, SHELTER, RE-HOUSING FOR NEGLECTED AND UNWANTED ANIMALS, AND THE PROTECTION OF ALL ANIMALS FROM SUFFERING, ILL-USAGE AND CRUELTY 2 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO MAKE GRANTS TO CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS WHOSE MAIN OBJECT IS THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF ENDANGERED SPECIES OF ANIMALS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 WANSBECK HOUSE
ALN COURT
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE15 8ES
- Phone:
- 07484380953
- Email:
- serenas@btopenworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window