DAVID SHEPHERD CRICKET TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a charitable trust based in Devon with the simple aims of helping more children to play and enjoy the great game of cricket and helping the talented to become future stars of the game. We support programmes and projects that help young players, both boys and girls, in Devon. We raise funds via donations, a membership scheme to build a family of supporters, and by staging events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 14 July 2010: Standard registration
- 03 February 2014: Funds received from 1139876 THE DAVID SHEPHERD CRICKET FOUNDATION
- DEVON YOUTH CRICKET CHARITY (Previous name)
- DEVON YOUTH CRICKET FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann-Marie Presswell | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Churcher | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Wilfrid Evans | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Guy Peter Ellison Curry | Trustee | 03 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JACK DAVEY | Trustee | 03 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Stanley Arthur Gush | Trustee | 25 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALAN SWIFT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GAVIN BARRY DOUGLAS LANE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.68k | £6.51k | £8.76k | £19.44k | £6.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.74k | £7.41k | £7.73k | £25.85k | £12.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18/06/2010 AS AMENDED ON 03/01/2014
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO LIVE OR WERE BORN IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 18 BY PROVIDING EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES, EDUCATION AND COACHING FOR THE PLAYING OF CRICKET SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED 2 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF CRICKET
Area of benefit
THE COUNTY OF DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
LINDEN COTTAGE
POLTIMORE
EXETER
EX4 0AT
- Phone:
- 07885643234
- Email:
- info@dsct111.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window