Financial history ST COLUMBA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1136632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £275.36k £299.50k £321.25k £312.45k £322.94k
Total expenditure £238.78k £263.94k £290.71k £300.14k £333.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £241.50k
Income from government grants £215.16k N/A N/A £226.55k N/A